TX SB709 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to representation of a person in a special education impartial due process hearing.
Title
Relating to representation of a person in a special education impartial due process hearing.
Sponsors
Sen. Eddie Lucio [D] | Rep. Alma Allen [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-22 - House - SB 709Third Reading House (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-14 | Effective immediately | |
2013-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-05-28 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-27 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-26 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2013-05-26 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-25 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2013-05-25 | Senate | Read |
2013-05-25 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2013-05-23 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2013-05-22 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-22 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-22 | House | Passed |
2013-05-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-22 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-22 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2013-05-22 | House | Amended |
2013-05-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-22 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2013-05-21 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2013-05-20 | House | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. |
2013-05-20 | House | Withdrawn from calendar |
2013-05-20 | House | Vote reconsidered |
2013-05-20 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2013-05-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-20 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2013-05-17 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2013-05-09 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2013-05-09 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-05-08 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-05-07 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-05-07 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2013-05-07 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2013-05-07 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-05-07 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-05-07 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-17 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2013-04-17 | House | Read first time |
2013-04-17 | House | Received from the Senate |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Passed |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Filed |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Disabilities, Persons with
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Special
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Admin. Procedure
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Special
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Admin. Procedure