TX SB818 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-19 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-19 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the disposition of real property interests by navigation districts and port authorities.
Title
Relating to the disposition of real property interests by navigation districts and port authorities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-06 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1218 (Y: 125 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-19 | Effective immediately | |
2023-05-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2023-05-09 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-09 | House | Signed in the House |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-08 | Senate | House passage reported |
2023-05-06 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-06 | House | Record vote RV#1218 |
2023-05-06 | House | Passed |
2023-05-06 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-05 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2023-05-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-05 | House | Laid out in lieu of companion HB 1511 |
2023-05-02 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-05-01 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-05-01 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-24 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-04-24 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-12 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2023-04-12 | House | Read first time |
2023-04-03 | House | Received from the Senate |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Passed |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Filed |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1511 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Laid on the table subject to call
HB1511 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Laid on the table subject to call
HB1511 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Laid on the table subject to call
Subjects
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Navigation & Ports
Property Interests--Real Property
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Navigation & Ports