TX SB847 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-17 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-17 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the student recreational facility fee at The University of Texas at Tyler.
Title
Relating to the student recreational facility fee at The University of Texas at Tyler.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2680 (Similar To) 2019-06-10 - Effective immediately
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Higher--Student Fees
RECREATIONAL & CULTURAL FACILITIES
UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS AT TYLER
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Higher--Student Fees
RECREATIONAL & CULTURAL FACILITIES
UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS AT TYLER
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB847 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00847I.htm |