TX SB848 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-12 - Referred to Public Health
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-12 - Referred to Public Health
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the regulation of medical radiologic technology; providing an administrative penalty; imposing fees; requiring an occupational license.
Title
Relating to the regulation of medical radiologic technology; providing an administrative penalty; imposing fees; requiring an occupational license.
Sponsors
Sen. Craig Estes [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2015-05-12 | House | Read first time |
2015-05-07 | House | Received from the Senate |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Passed to engrossment |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Filed |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
MEDICAL BOARD, TEXAS
MEDICAL RADIOLOGIC TECHNOLOGISTS
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
MEDICAL BOARD, TEXAS
MEDICAL RADIOLOGIC TECHNOLOGISTS
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations