TX SB848 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the licensing and regulation of providers of driver and traffic safety education.
Title
Relating to the licensing and regulation of providers of driver and traffic safety education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-27 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1814 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1814 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-09 | Effective immediately | |
2017-06-09 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-28 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-28 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-28 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-27 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-27 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2017-05-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-27 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2017-05-27 | Senate | Read |
2017-05-27 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2017-05-25 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2017-05-24 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-24 | House | Passed |
2017-05-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-24 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-24 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-05-21 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-05-19 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-18 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-16 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-16 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-05-16 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-05-16 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-16 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-16 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-05-16 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-05-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-16 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-09 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2017-05-09 | House | Read first time |
2017-05-04 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Filed |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
CONTINUING EDUCATION
Education
Education--Driver Education & Training
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS COMMISSION OF
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses
Education
Education--Driver Education & Training
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS COMMISSION OF
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses