TX SB887 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-21 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-21 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the penalty for theft of an automated teller machine or the contents or components of an automated teller machine.
Title
Relating to the penalty for theft of an automated teller machine or the contents or components of an automated teller machine.
Sponsors
Sen. John Carona [R] | Rep. Stefani Carter [R] | Rep. Pete Gallego [D] | Sen. Joan Huffman [R] |
Sen. Dan Patrick [R] | Rep. Debbie Riddle [R] | Sen. Nicholas Taylor [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-21 | Effective on 9/1/11 | |
2011-05-21 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-11 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-11 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-11 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-10 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-10 | House passage reported | |
2011-05-09 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-09 | Record vote | |
2011-05-09 | Passed | |
2011-05-09 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-07 | Passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-05-07 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-07 | Laid out in lieu of companion | |
2011-05-07 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-05-07 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-07 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-05-06 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-05-06 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-05-05 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-05-05 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-05-05 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-03 | Meeting cancelled | |
2011-05-03 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-19 | Withdrawn from schedule | |
2011-04-19 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-11 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | |
2011-04-11 | Read first time | |
2011-03-31 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-03-31 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-03-31 | Record vote | |
2011-03-31 | Passed | |
2011-03-31 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-03-31 | Record vote | |
2011-03-31 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-03-31 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-03-31 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2011-03-31 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-03-30 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-03-28 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-03-28 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-03-28 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2011-03-22 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-03-22 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-22 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-16 | Co-author authorized | |
2011-03-01 | Referred to Criminal Justice | |
2011-03-01 | Read first time | |
2011-02-23 | Filed | |
2011-02-23 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
AUTOMATED TELLER MACHINES
Crimes
Crimes--Against Property
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Crimes
Crimes--Against Property
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment