TX SB95 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Summary
Relating to prohibiting the use of unsafe children's products in certain nonresidential child-care facilities.
Title
Relating to prohibiting the use of unsafe children's products in certain nonresidential child-care facilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-19 | Effective on 9/1/09 | |
2009-05-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-05-07 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-07 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-07 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-06 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-06 | House passage reported | |
2009-05-05 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-05 | Record vote | |
2009-05-05 | Passed | |
2009-05-05 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-04 | Passed to 3rd reading | |
2009-05-04 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-04 | Laid out in lieu of companion | |
2009-04-28 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-27 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-27 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-27 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-04-27 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-04-14 | Referred to State Affairs | |
2009-04-14 | Read first time | |
2009-04-09 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-04-09 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-09 | Record vote | |
2009-04-09 | Passed | |
2009-04-09 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-09 | Record vote | |
2009-04-09 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-04-09 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-09 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-09 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-04-09 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-08 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2009-04-02 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-04-01 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-01 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-01 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-03-30 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-30 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-10 | Referred to State Affairs | |
2009-02-10 | Read first time | |
2008-11-10 | Filed | |
2008-11-10 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB217 (Same As) 2009-05-04 - Laid on the table subject to call
Subjects
Consumer Protection
Day Care
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
INTERNET
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Day Care
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
INTERNET
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF