TX SB971 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-23 - Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-23 - Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
Summary
Relating to an interlocal contract for a relief highway route around certain municipalities; providing authority to issue bonds.
Title
Relating to an interlocal contract for a relief highway route around certain municipalities; providing authority to issue bonds.
Sponsors
Rep. Tryon Lewis [R] | Sen. Kel Seliger [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-23 | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. | |
2009-05-23 | Withdrawn from calendar | |
2009-05-22 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-19 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-05-12 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-05-11 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-11 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-07 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-05-07 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-05-07 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-07 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-16 | Referred to Urban Affairs | |
2009-04-16 | Read first time | |
2009-04-09 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-04-09 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-09 | Record vote | |
2009-04-09 | Passed | |
2009-04-09 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-09 | Record vote | |
2009-04-09 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-04-09 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-09 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-09 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-04-09 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-03-31 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-03-31 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-03-31 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-03-30 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-03-30 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-30 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-09 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | |
2009-03-09 | Read first time | |
2009-02-19 | Filed | |
2009-02-19 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1255 (Same As) 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately