TX SJR32 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 26 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-29 - Filed with the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 26 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-29 - Filed with the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment to allow the transfer of a law enforcement animal to a qualified caretaker in certain circumstances.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment to allow the transfer of a law enforcement animal to a qualified caretaker in certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - House - Adopted RV#665 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | Filed with the Secretary of State | |
2019-04-29 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2019-04-26 | Senate | House passage reported |
2019-04-25 | House | Record vote RV#665 |
2019-04-25 | House | Adopted |
2019-04-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-25 | House | Laid out in lieu of companion HJR 96 |
2019-04-24 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-24 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-23 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-18 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-18 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-17 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2019-04-17 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-16 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Meeting cancelled |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Filed |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HJR96 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Laid on the table subject to call
SB2100 (Enabled by) 2019-05-14 - Effective immediately
SB2100 (Enabled by) 2019-05-14 - Effective immediately
Subjects
Animals
County Government
County Government--General
Law Enforcement
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
County Government
County Government--General
Law Enforcement
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments