US HB1015 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-21 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-21 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Protecting Business Opportunities for Veterans Act of 2015 Extends subcontracting limitations that apply to certain small businesses awarded contracts under various Small Business Administration (SBA) programs to small business concerns owned and controlled by veterans with or without service-connected disabilities who are awarded Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) contracts. Requires, for purposes of applying such subcontracting limitations to veterans with small businesses awarded such VA contracts, that: (1) small businesses owned and controlled by veterans be treated in the same manner as small businesses owned and controlled by veterans with service-connected disabilities, and (2) "similarly situated entities" include subcontractors for small businesses owned and controlled by a veteran with or without a service-connected disability (contract amounts expended by small businesses on subcontractors that are similarly situated entities are not considered toward subcontracting limits). Directs the VA Secretary, before awarding such a contract, to obtain from the offeror a certification: (1) specifying and promising to comply with the subcontracting performance requirements applicable to such offeror, and (2) acknowledging that the certification is subject to criminal laws concerning false or fraudulent statements or representations. Subjects small businesses to fines, imprisonment, or both for not acting in good faith. Requires the VA's Chief Acquisition Officer and the Director of the Office of Small and Disadvantaged Business Utilization to: (1) establish a process to monitor the subcontracting requirement compliance of veterans' small businesses that are awarded VA contracts, and (2) refer violations to the VA's Inspector General. Directs the Inspector General to submit annual reports to Congress regarding such violations.
Title
Protecting Business Opportunities for Veterans Act of 2015
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Huelskamp [R-KS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-21 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote . |
2015-04-21 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-03-19 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2015-03-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations. |
2015-03-13 | House | Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity Discharged. |
2015-03-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. |
2015-02-20 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2015-02-20 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Congressional oversight
Disability and paralysis
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Public contracts and procurement
Small business
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Congressional oversight
Disability and paralysis
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Public contracts and procurement
Small business
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/1015/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr1015/BILLS-114hr1015ih.pdf |