US HB1122 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-12 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-12 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the Department of Housing and Urban Development (HUD) to implement a mobility demonstration program to enable public housing agencies (PHAs) to administer housing-choice rental-assistance vouchers in a manner designed to (1) encourage low-income families receiving such assistance to move to lower-poverty areas, and (2) expand access to opportunity areas. HUD shall require PHAs applying to participate in the program to submit a specified Regional Housing Mobility Plan.
Title
Housing Choice Voucher Mobility Demonstration Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO] | Rep. Sean Duffy [R-WI] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-11 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 119 (Y: 387 N: 22 NV: 22 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-12 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
2019-03-11 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-03-11 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 387 - 22 (Roll no. 119). (text: CR H2618-2619) |
2019-03-11 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2626-2627) |
2019-03-11 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2019-03-11 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1122. |
2019-03-11 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2618-2620) |
2019-03-11 | House | Ms. Waters moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-02-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2019-02-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB291 (Related) 2019-01-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HB648 (Related) 2019-01-28 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 16.
HJR31 (Related) 2019-02-15 - Became Public Law No: 116-6. (TXT | PDF)
HB648 (Related) 2019-01-28 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 16.
HJR31 (Related) 2019-02-15 - Became Public Law No: 116-6. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Government information and archives
Housing and community development
Housing and community development funding
Housing supply and affordability
Low- and moderate-income housing
Public housing
User charges and fees
Government information and archives
Housing and community development
Housing and community development funding
Housing supply and affordability
Low- and moderate-income housing
Public housing
User charges and fees