US HB1155 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 6.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 6.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To prohibit the phase out of gasoline and prevent higher prices for consumers, and for other purposes.
Title
Keeping America’s Refineries Act
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Crenshaw [R-TX] | Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX] | Rep. Gregory Pence [R-IN] | Rep. John Joyce [R-PA] |
Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA] | Rep. Jeff Duncan [R-SC] | Rep. John Curtis [R-UT] | Rep. August Pfluger [R-TX] |
Rep. Tim Walberg [R-MI] | Rep. Larry Bucshon [R-IN] | Rep. Rick Allen [R-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 6. |
2023-03-23 | House | Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 118-13. |
2023-03-09 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 26 - 19. |
2023-03-09 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2023-02-28 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by the Yeas and Nays: 10 - 6 . |
2023-02-28 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2023-02-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment, Manufacturing, and Critical Minerals. |
2023-02-24 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2023-02-24 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1 (Related) 2023-03-30 - The Clerk was authorized to correct section numbers, punctuation, and cross references, and to make other necessary technical and conforming corrections in the engrossment of H.R. 1.
SB947 (Related) 2023-03-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB2811 (Related) 2023-05-04 - Committee on the Budget. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 118-76.
SB947 (Related) 2023-03-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB2811 (Related) 2023-05-04 - Committee on the Budget. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 118-76.