US HB1158 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 7.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 7.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Toxic Substances Control Act with respect to new critical energy resources, and for other purposes.
Title
Elimination of Future Technology Delays Act of 2023
Sponsors
Rep. John Curtis [R-UT] | Rep. Rick Allen [R-GA] | Rep. Jeff Duncan [R-SC] | Rep. Tim Walberg [R-MI] |
Rep. Larry Bucshon [R-IN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 7. |
2023-03-23 | House | Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 118-14. |
2023-03-09 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 27 - 21. |
2023-03-09 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2023-02-28 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by the Yeas and Nays: 13 - 6 . |
2023-02-28 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2023-02-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Innovation, Data, and Commerce. |
2023-02-24 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2023-02-24 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1 (Related) 2023-03-30 - The Clerk was authorized to correct section numbers, punctuation, and cross references, and to make other necessary technical and conforming corrections in the engrossment of H.R. 1.
SB947 (Related) 2023-03-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB2811 (Related) 2023-05-04 - Committee on the Budget. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 118-76.
SB947 (Related) 2023-03-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB2811 (Related) 2023-05-04 - Committee on the Budget. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 118-76.