US HB1215 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Chetco River Protection Act of 2013 - Amends the Wild and Scenic Rivers Act to make corrections to the segment designations for the Chetco River, Oregon, including revising segment lengths. Withdraws the federal land within the boundaries of a certain segment of the Chetco River from: (1) entry, appropriation, or disposal under the public land laws; (2) location, entry, and patent under the mining laws; and (3) disposition under laws pertaining to mineral and geothermal leasing or mineral materials.
Title
Chetco River Protection Act of 2013
Sponsors
Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation. |
2013-03-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1526 (Related) 2013-09-23 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB353 (Related) 2013-09-10 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 178.
SB1784 (Related) 2014-12-11 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 646.
SB2734 (Related) 2014-07-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB4 (Related) 2014-11-13 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 597.
SB353 (Related) 2013-09-10 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 178.
SB1784 (Related) 2014-12-11 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 646.
SB2734 (Related) 2014-07-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB4 (Related) 2014-11-13 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 597.
Subjects
Land transfers
Oregon
Public lands and natural resources
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Oregon
Public lands and natural resources
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/1215/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr1215/BILLS-113hr1215ih.pdf |