US HB1269 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 55-15)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-31 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-31 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
National Women's History Museum Act of 2011 - Directs the Administrator of General Services (GSA) to convey, by quitclaim deed, to the National Women's History Museum, Inc. (the Museum) specified property in the District of Columbia, on terms which the Administrator deems appropriate. Requires the purchase price for the property to be: (1) its market value based on its highest and best use, as determined by an independent appraisal; and (2) paid into the Federal Buildings Fund. Requires the property to be dedicated for use as a site for a national women's history museum for a 99-year period. Provides for the reversion of the property to the United States without any obligation for repayment of any amount of the purchase price if: (1) it is not used as a site for a national women's history museum during the 99-year period, and (2) the Museum has not commenced construction of a museum facility on such property in a 5-year period other than for reasons beyond the Museum's control.
Title
National Women's History Museum Act of 2011
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-31 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management. |
2011-03-30 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2011-03-30 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E570) |
Same As/Similar To
SB680 (Same As) 2011-05-02 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 37.
HB2844 (Related) 2011-09-08 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
SB1870 (Related) 2011-11-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. (text of measure as introduced: CR S7453-7454)
HB2844 (Related) 2011-09-08 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
SB1870 (Related) 2011-11-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. (text of measure as introduced: CR S7453-7454)
Subjects
District of Columbia
Land transfers
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Public lands and natural resources
U.S. history
Women's rights
Land transfers
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Public lands and natural resources
U.S. history
Women's rights
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/1269/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr1269/BILLS-112hr1269ih.pdf |