US HB1306 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-08 - Became Public Law No: 115-103. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-08 - Became Public Law No: 115-103. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Western Oregon Tribal Fairness Act
Title
Western Oregon Tribal Fairness Act
Sponsors
Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] | Rep. Greg Walden [R-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 115-103. (TXT | PDF) |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2017-12-27 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2017-12-22 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2017-12-21 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S8267-8269) |
2017-07-12 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2017-07-11 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-07-11 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5412-5413) |
2017-07-11 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1306. |
2017-07-11 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5412-5414) |
2017-07-11 | House | Mr. LaHood moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2017-07-11 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 141. |
2017-07-11 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-204. |
2017-06-27 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2017-06-27 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-03-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs. |
2017-03-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2017-03-02 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2017-03-02 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB508 (Same As) 2017-05-23 - Star Print ordered on report 115-65.
SB1460 (Related) 2017-09-19 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held.
SB1460 (Related) 2017-09-19 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held.
Subjects
Federal-Indian relations
Gambling
Indian lands and resources rights
Land transfers
Native Americans
Oregon
Gambling
Indian lands and resources rights
Land transfers
Native Americans
Oregon