US HB1325 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-6)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Comprehensive Immunosuppressive Drug Coverage for Kidney Transplant Patients Act of 2013 - Amends title II (Old Age, Survivors and Disability Benefits) (OASDI) of the Social Security Act (SSA) to extend the months of coverage of immunosuppressive drugs for kidney transplant patients. Amends SSA title XVIII (Medicare) to make eligible for enrollment in Medicare part B (Supplementary Medical Insurance), solely for the purpose of such drug coverage, every individual whose insurance benefits under Medicare part A (Hospital Insurance) have ended by reason of a kidney transplant or the end of any requirement for a regular course of dialysis. Directs the Secretary of Health and Human Services (HHS) to determine a monthly premium rate for such individuals equal to 35% of the monthly actuarial rate for enrollees age 65 and over. Prescribes a formula for detemination of a government contribution to such a premium.
Title
Comprehensive Immunosuppressive Drug Coverage for Kidney Transplant Patients Act of 2013
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX] | Rep. Spencer Bachus [R-AL] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] | Rep. Lois Capps [D-CA] |
Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] | Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN] | Rep. Ander Crenshaw [R-FL] | Rep. Michael Grimm [R-NY] |
Rep. James Himes [D-CT] | Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI] | Rep. David Loebsack [D-IA] | Rep. Tom Marino [R-PA] |
Rep. Jim McDermott [D-WA] | Rep. Patrick Tiberi [R-OH] | Rep. Frank Wolf [R-VA] | Rep. C.W. Young [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2013-03-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2013-03-21 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2013-03-21 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2013-03-21 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
SB323 (Related) 2013-02-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (text of measure as introduced: CR S715)
HB1428 (Same As) 2013-04-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB1428 (Same As) 2013-04-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/1325/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr1325/BILLS-113hr1325ih.pdf |