US HB135 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-16 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 330.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-16 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 330.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires each federal agency to establish a model Equal Employment Opportunity Program that is independent of the agency's Human Capital or General Counsel office, and it establishes requirements related to complaints of discrimination and retaliation in the workplace. An agency must publish a notice of any final agency action or Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (EEOC) appellate decision involving a finding of prohibited discrimination or retaliation, and it must report certain data with respect to specified equal opportunity complaints. Each agency must establish a system to track complaints of discrimination and include a notation of any adverse action taken against an employee for discrimination or retaliation in the employee's personnel record. The EEOC must refer to the Office of Special Counsel a matter about which it issues an appellate decision involving a finding of discrimination or retaliation within a federal agency, and the Office of Special Counsel shall accept and review such referral for purposes of seeking disciplinary action. An employee who has authority to take, recommend, or approve any personnel action shall not implement or enforce a nondisclosure policy that prohibits or restricts an employee from disclosing information relating to (1) a violation of any law, rule, or regulation; (2) mismanagement, gross waste of funds, or abuse of authority; (3) a substantial and specific danger to public health or safety; or (4) any other whistle-blower protection.
Title
Federal Employee Antidiscrimination Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Elijah Cummings [D-MD] | Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. James Sensenbrenner [R-WI] |
Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-15 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 33 (Y: 424 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 330. |
2019-12-16 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-176. |
2019-11-06 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2019-01-15 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-01-15 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 424 - 0 (Roll no. 33). (text: CR H558-560) |
2019-01-15 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H580) |
2019-01-15 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2019-01-15 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 135. |
2019-01-15 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H558-562) |
2019-01-15 | House | Mr. Cummings moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-01-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform. |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
Subjects
Administrative remedies
Congressional oversight
Employee performance
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations
Office of Special Counsel
Personnel records
Congressional oversight
Employee performance
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations
Office of Special Counsel
Personnel records