US HB1364 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment and the Economy.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Environment and the Economy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment and the Economy.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Environment and the Economy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Nuclear Waste Informed Consent Act This bill prohibits the Nuclear Regulatory Commission from authorizing construction of a nuclear waste repository unless the Secretary of Energy has entered into an agreement to host the repository with the following entities: the governor of the state in which the repository is proposed to be located, each affected unit of local government, any unit of general local government contiguous to the affected unit if spent nuclear fuel or high-level radioactive waste will be transported through that unit of general local government for disposal at the repository, and each affected Indian tribe. Furthermore, any agreement to host the repository must meet the following conditions: it must be written and signed by all parties, it must be binding on the parties, and it shall not be amended or revoked except by mutual agreement of the parties.
Title
Nuclear Waste Informed Consent Act
Sponsors
Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] | Rep. Joseph Heck [R-NV] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-20 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment and the Economy. |
2015-03-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2015-03-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB691 (Same As) 2015-03-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. (text of measure as introduced: CR S1387)
SB1825 (Related) 2015-07-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. (text of measure as introduced: CR S5456)
SB1825 (Related) 2015-07-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. (text of measure as introduced: CR S5456)
Subjects
Energy
Federal-Indian relations
Intergovernmental relations
Nuclear power
Radioactive wastes and releases
State and local government operations
Federal-Indian relations
Intergovernmental relations
Nuclear power
Radioactive wastes and releases
State and local government operations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/1364/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr1364/BILLS-114hr1364ih.pdf |