US HB1423 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Self-Insurance Protection Act This bill amends the Public Health Service Act, the Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974 (ERISA), and the Internal Revenue Code to exclude from the definition of "health insurance coverage" a stop-loss policy obtained by a self-insured health plan or a sponsor of a self-insured group health plan to reimburse the plan or sponsor for losses incurred in providing health benefits to plan participants in excess of a level set forth in the stop-loss policy.
Title
Self-Insurance Protection Act
Sponsors
Rep. David Roe [R-TN] | Rep. Pete Olson [R-TX] | Rep. Lou Barletta [R-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions. |
2015-03-20 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2015-03-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2015-03-18 | House | Referred to House Education and the Workforce |
2015-03-18 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2015-03-18 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2015-03-18 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-03-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB775 (Same As) 2015-03-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Employee benefits and pensions
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Insurance industry and regulation
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Insurance industry and regulation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/1423/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr1423/BILLS-114hr1423ih.pdf |