US HB1428 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on February 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-24 - Became Public Law No: 114-126. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on February 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-24 - Became Public Law No: 114-126. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Judicial Redress Act of 2015 (Sec. 2) This bill authorizes the Department of Justice (DOJ) to designate foreign countries or regional economic integration organizations whose natural citizens may bring civil actions under the Privacy Act of 1974 against certain U.S. government agencies for purposes of accessing, amending, or redressing unlawful disclosures of records transferred from a foreign country to the United States to prevent, investigate, detect, or prosecute criminal offenses. The citizens of such countries or organizations may bring a civil action against: (1) U.S. agencies that intentionally or willfully violate conditions for disclosing records without the consent of the individual to whom the record pertains; and (2) U.S. agencies designated by DOJ, with the concurrence of the agency, that refuse an individual's request to review or amend his or her records. DOJ, with the concurrence of the Department of State, the Department of the Treasury, and the Department of Homeland Security, may designate countries or organizations whose citizens may pursue such civil remedies if the person's country or organization: (1) has appropriate privacy protections for sharing information with the United States, as provided for in an agreement with the United States or as determined by DOJ; (2) permits the transfer of personal data for commercial purposes between its territory and the United States; and (3) has DOJ-certified data transfer policies that do not impede U.S. national security interests. A country's designation may be revoked if it: (1) is not complying with a privacy protection agreement, (2) no longer has appropriate privacy protections for sharing information, (3) fails to meet requirements for transfers of personal data for commercial purposes, (4) no longer meets the DOJ's transfer policy certification requirements, or (5) impedes the transfer of information to the United States (for purposes of reporting or preventing unlawful activity) by a private entity or person. DOJ's designations are exempt from judicial or administrative review. The U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia is granted exclusive jurisdiction over any claim arising under this Act.
Title
Judicial Redress Act of 2015
Sponsors
Rep. James Sensenbrenner [R-WI] | Rep. John Conyers [D-MI] | Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA] | Rep. Randy Forbes [R-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-24 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 114-126. (TXT | PDF) |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 114-126. (TXT | PDF) |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-02-10 | Senate | On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection. (text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H694) |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Mr. Goodlatte asked unanimous consent that the House agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H694) |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S756-757; text as passed Senate: CR S756-757) |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 356. |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Grassley with an amendment. Without written report. |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably. |
2015-10-21 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
2015-10-20 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2015-10-20 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6985-6986) |
2015-10-20 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1428. |
2015-10-20 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6985-6988) |
2015-10-20 | House | Mr. Goodlatte moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2015-10-20 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 223. |
2015-10-20 | House | Committee on Oversight and Government discharged. |
2015-10-20 | House | Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 114-294, Part I. |
2015-09-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2015-09-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-09-16 | House | Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice Discharged. |
2015-04-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice. |
2015-03-18 | House | Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform |
2015-03-18 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2015-03-18 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-03-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1600 (Same As) 2015-06-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Civil actions and liability
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Government information and archives
International organizations and cooperation
Law
Right of privacy
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Government information and archives
International organizations and cooperation
Law
Right of privacy