US HB1431 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the National Labor Relations Act and the Railway Labor Act to prohibit the preemption of State stalking laws. Amends the National Labor Relations Act and the Railway Labor Act to declare that nothing in those Acts shall be construed to preempt a law of any state, U.S. territory, or the District of Columbia that prohibits, criminalizes, or creates a civil cause of action for stalking, cyberstalking, or harassment.
Title
To amend the National Labor Relations Act and the Railway Labor Act to prohibit the preemption of State stalking laws.
Sponsors
Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA] | Rep. Tom Price [R-GA] | Rep. Glenn Grothman [R-WI] | Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] |
Rep. Rick Allen [R-GA] | Rep. John Duncan [R-TN] | Rep. Barry Loudermilk [R-GA] | Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA] |
Rep. Lynn Westmoreland [R-GA] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] | Rep. Trent Franks [R-AZ] | Rep. Joseph Pitts [R-PA] |
Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] | Rep. Jody Hice [R-GA] | Rep. Louie Gohmert [R-TX] | Rep. Steven Palazzo [R-MS] |
Rep. Jeff Miller [R-FL] | Rep. Jeff Duncan [R-SC] | Rep. Robert Pittenger [R-NC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions. |
2015-03-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials. |
2015-03-18 | House | Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure |
2015-03-18 | House | Referred to House Education and the Workforce |
2015-03-18 | House | Referred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-03-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1432 (Related) 2015-11-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Assault and harassment offenses
Civil actions and liability
Federal preemption
Labor and employment
Labor-management relations
Railroads
State and local government operations
Transportation employees
Civil actions and liability
Federal preemption
Labor and employment
Labor-management relations
Railroads
State and local government operations
Transportation employees
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/1431/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr1431/BILLS-114hr1431ih.pdf |