US HB1435 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
National Trails System Willing Seller Act - Amends the National Trails System Act to: (1) prohibit the federal acquisition of lands outside the exterior boundaries of any federally administered area, except with the owner's consent, for the Oregon, Mormon Pioneer, Lewis and Clark, Iditarod, and Nez Perce National Historic Trails and the Continental Divide, North Country, Ice Age, and Potomac Heritage National Scenic Trails; and (2) provide that federal authority to acquire fee title shall be limited to an average of not more than one-quarter mile on either side of such national historic trails and the Continental Divide National Scenic Trail.
Title
National Trails System Willing Seller Act
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Coffman [R-CO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-16 | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands. | |
2009-03-11 | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB146 (Related) 2009-03-30 - Became Public Law No: 111-11.
SB189 (Same As) 2009-01-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. (text of measure as introduced: CR S232)
SB189 (Same As) 2009-01-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. (text of measure as introduced: CR S232)
Subjects
Alaska
District of Columbia
Historic sites and heritage areas
Illinois
Land transfers
Maryland
Montana
New Mexico
New York State
North Dakota
Oregon
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Utah
Virginia
West Virginia
Wisconsin
District of Columbia
Historic sites and heritage areas
Illinois
Land transfers
Maryland
Montana
New Mexico
New York State
North Dakota
Oregon
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Utah
Virginia
West Virginia
Wisconsin
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-bill/1435/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hr1435/BILLS-111hr1435ih.pdf |