US HB1474 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Intelligence (Permanent Select).
Pending: House Intelligence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Intelligence (Permanent Select).
Pending: House Intelligence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Office of the Director of National Intelligence (ODNI) to report to Congress and state election officials on threats to election infrastructure, including cybersecurity threats. The ODNI shall submit the initial report 180 days before each regularly scheduled federal election and update such initial reports as necessary.
Title
Strengthening Elections Through Intelligence Act
Sponsors
Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA] | Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] |
Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS] | Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] | Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN] |
Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA] | Rep. Kendra Horn [D-OK] |
Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] | Rep. Jeff Van Drew [R-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Intelligence (Permanent Select). |
2019-02-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 39.
SB949 (Related) 2019-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB8697 (Related) 2020-10-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Intelligence (Permanent Select).
SB949 (Related) 2019-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB8697 (Related) 2020-10-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Intelligence (Permanent Select).
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Computer security and identity theft
Congressional elections
Congressional oversight
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Government studies and investigations
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
State and local government operations
Subversive activities
Computer security and identity theft
Congressional elections
Congressional oversight
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Government studies and investigations
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
State and local government operations
Subversive activities
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/1474/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr1474/BILLS-116hr1474ih.pdf |