US HB1555 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-15 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-15 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
International Tax Competitiveness Act of 2013 - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to: (1) treat foreign corporations that are managed, directly or indirectly, within the United States as domestic corporations for U.S. tax purposes; (2) subject certain royalty income and income from intangibles received from a controlled foreign corporation to U.S. taxation; and (3) revise the tax treatment of property other than stock received in connection with a corporate reorganization (i.e., boot) to provide that such property shall be treated as a taxable dividend.
Title
International Tax Competitiveness Act of 2013
Sponsors
Rep. Lloyd Doggett [D-TX] | Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA] | Rep. Xavier Becerra [D-CA] | Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] |
Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. John Conyers [D-MI] |
Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] | Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO] | Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT] | Rep. John Dingell [D-MI] |
Rep. Keith Ellison [D-MN] | Rep. Chaka Fattah [D-PA] | Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] | Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA] |
Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Jim McDermott [D-WA] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. James Moran [D-VA] |
Rep. Beto O'Rourke [D-TX] | Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] | Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] | Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] |
Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] | Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] | Rep. Niki Tsongas [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3666 (Related) 2013-12-05 - Referred to House Budget
HB3793 (Related) 2014-01-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
SB1844 (Related) 2013-12-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB3793 (Related) 2014-01-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
SB1844 (Related) 2013-12-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Corporate finance and management
Foreign and international corporations
Interest, dividends, interest rates
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Taxation
Taxation of foreign income
Foreign and international corporations
Interest, dividends, interest rates
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Taxation
Taxation of foreign income
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/1555/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr1555/BILLS-113hr1555ih.pdf |