US HB1602 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To direct the Commodity Futures Trading Commission and the Securities and Exchange Commission to jointly establish a digital asset working group, and for other purposes.
Title
Eliminate Barriers to Innovation Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Patrick McHenry [R-NC] | Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA] | Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA] | Sen. Ted Budd [R-NC] |
Rep. Warren Davidson [R-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
2021-04-20 | House | Pursuant to section 6 of H. Res. 330, and the motion offered by Mr. Hoyer, the following bills passed under suspension of the rules: H.R. 367; H.R. 370; H.R. 396; H.R. 397, as amended; H.R. 408; H.R. 490; H.R. 965, as amended; H.R. 1251, as amended; H.R. 1395; H.R. 1491; H.R. 1528; H.R. 1532; H.R. 1565; H.R. 1602; and H.R. 2523, as amended; and the following resolution was agreed to under suspension of the rules: H. Res. 124, as amended. (consideration: CR H1979-1994; text: CR H1990) |
2021-04-20 | House | Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 330, proceedings on H.R. 1602 are considered vacated. |
2021-04-19 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2021-04-19 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1602. |
2021-04-19 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1924-1927; text: CR H1924) |
2021-04-19 | House | Mr. Perlmutter moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2021-04-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit. |
2021-03-08 | House | Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-03-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR330 (Related) 2021-04-20 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.