US HB1779 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit.
Pending: House Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit.
Pending: House Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To improve the process for awarding grants under certain programs of the Department of Agriculture to certain counties in which the majority of land is owned or managed by the Federal Government and to other units of local government and Tribal governments in those counties, and for other purposes.
Title
MORE USDA Grants Act More Opportunities for Rural Economies from USDA Grants Act
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Stewart [R-UT] | Rep. Matt Rosendale [R-MT] | Rep. Burgess Owens [R-UT] | Rep. Dan Newhouse [R-WA] |
Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] | Rep. Yvette Herrell [R-NM] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit. |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology. |
2021-03-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on Agriculture, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-03-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB647 (Same As) 2021-03-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/1779/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr1779/BILLS-117hr1779ih.pdf |