US HB1814 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 183-27-1-1)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To permanently reauthorize the Land and Water Conservation Fund. Amends the Land and Water Conservation Fund Act of 1965 to make permanent the authorization for the Land and Water Conservation Fund. Requires not less than 1.5% of the annual authorized funding amount or $10 million, whichever is greater, to be used for projects that secure recreational public access to existing federal public land for hunting, fishing, and other recreational purposes.
Title
To permanently reauthorize the Land and Water Conservation Fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-30 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans. |
2015-04-30 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2015-04-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2015-04-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB338 (Same As) 2015-02-03 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 10.
SB890 (Related) 2015-03-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB1925 (Related) 2015-08-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB2012 (Related) 2016-09-08 - Conference held.
SB556 (Related) 2015-12-16 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 328.
SB2089 (Related) 2015-09-29 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 241.
SB890 (Related) 2015-03-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB1925 (Related) 2015-08-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB2012 (Related) 2016-09-08 - Conference held.
SB556 (Related) 2015-12-16 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 328.
SB2089 (Related) 2015-09-29 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 241.
Subjects
Hunting and fishing
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Outdoor recreation
Public lands and natural resources
State and local finance
Water use and supply
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Outdoor recreation
Public lands and natural resources
State and local finance
Water use and supply
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/1814/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr1814/BILLS-114hr1814ih.pdf |