US HB2094 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Lead Free Schools Act of 2017 This bill amends the Safe Drinking Water Act to direct the Environmental Protection Agency (EPA) to revise national primary drinking water regulations for lead and copper within nine months. The revised regulations must ensure that: corrosion controls are reevaluated anytime source water or treatment is changed; test results are valid by prohibiting techniques that artificially lower lead levels; monitoring includes school sites for all public water systems serving schools; notification of lead problems is clear and effective; and lead service lines, which are controlled by public water systems, are fully replaced on a set timetable and whenever contamination is detected. The EPA must: (1) publish a maximum contaminant level goal and promulgate a national primary drinking water regulation for perfluorinated compounds within two years, and (2) determine whether to regulate 1,4-dioxane within two years. The EPA must establish a grant program for replacing drinking water fountains manufactured prior to 1988 that are located in schools or day care facilities with fountains that are lead free. The bill reauthorizes for FY2018-FY2022 the voluntary school and child care program lead testing grant program.
Title
Lead Free Schools Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment. |
2017-04-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2017-04-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2479 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
HB3106 (Related) 2017-07-14 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H5870)
HB4908 (Related) 2018-02-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
HB3106 (Related) 2017-07-14 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H5870)
HB4908 (Related) 2018-02-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Child health
Education programs funding
Educational facilities and institutions
Elementary and secondary education
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental regulatory procedures
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Metals
Water quality
Water use and supply
Child health
Education programs funding
Educational facilities and institutions
Elementary and secondary education
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental regulatory procedures
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Metals
Water quality
Water use and supply
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/2094/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr2094/BILLS-115hr2094ih.pdf |