US HB2256 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 140-1)
Status: Introduced on April 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expands the tax credit for new plug-in electric drive motor vehicles and extends the tax credit for new fuel cell motor vehicles. (Under current law, taxpayers who purchase a qualified plug-in electric drive motor vehicle are eligible for a tax credit of up to $7,500, which begins to phase out once a manufacturer sells 200,000 qualified vehicles.) The bill allows an additional 400,000 vehicles per manufacturer to be eligible for a credit of up to $7,000 before the credit begins to phase out. The bill also extends the tax credit for fuel cell motor vehicles through 2028. (Under current law, the credit expired after 2017.)
Title
Driving America Forward Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2019-04-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1094 (Same As) 2019-04-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB2 (Related) 2020-07-20 - Received in the Senate.
HB7330 (Related) 2020-06-25 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB7516 (Related) 2020-07-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation.
HB2 (Related) 2020-07-20 - Received in the Senate.
HB7330 (Related) 2020-06-25 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB7516 (Related) 2020-07-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation.
Subjects
Alternative and renewable resources
Energy efficiency and conservation
Hybrid, electric, and advanced technology vehicles
Income tax credits
Motor vehicles
Taxation
Energy efficiency and conservation
Hybrid, electric, and advanced technology vehicles
Income tax credits
Motor vehicles
Taxation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2256/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2256/BILLS-116hr2256ih.pdf |