US HB2344 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on June 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-08-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-08-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
TBI Treatment Act - Directs the Secretary of Defense (DOD) to carry out a five-year pilot program to establish a process for providing payments to health care facilities for investigational treatments of traumatic brain injury or post-traumatic stress disorder received by members of the Armed Forces in facilities other than military treatment facilities. Subjects such payments to specified conditions, including approval of the treatment by the Secretary and demonstrated improvement by the patient. Requires the Secretary to: (1) develop and maintain a database containing data from each patient case involving the use of such treatments, (2) establish a process to notify members of the Armed Forces of the opportunity to receive such treatments, and (3) report annually to Congress on the implementation of this Act and any available results of investigational treatment studies.
Title
TBI Treatment Act
Sponsors
Rep. Pete Sessions [R-TX] | Rep. Mike Coffman [R-CO] | Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. |
2013-06-17 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E894-895) |
2013-06-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1960 (Related) 2013-07-08 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 126.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Health care coverage and access
Health information and medical records
Hospital care
Mental health
Military medicine
Military personnel and dependents
Neurological disorders
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Health care coverage and access
Health information and medical records
Hospital care
Mental health
Military medicine
Military personnel and dependents
Neurological disorders
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/2344/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr2344/BILLS-113hr2344ih.pdf |