US HB2429 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-2)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Healthy Families and Communities.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 14 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Healthy Families and Communities.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Consumer Price Index for Elderly Consumers Act of 2009 - Directs the Bureau of Labor Statistics of the Department of Labor to prepare and publish a monthly Consumer Price Index for Elderly Consumers (CPI) that indicates changes over time in expenditures for consumption which are typical for individuals aged 62 years of age or older. Amends title II (Old Age, Survivors and Disability Insurance) (OASDI) to use such new CPI in the computation of cost-of-living increases for Social Security benefits.
Title
Consumer Price Index for Elderly Consumers Act of 2009
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Altmire [D-PA] | Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA] | Rep. Bobby Bright [D-AL] | Rep. Russ Carnahan [D-MO] |
Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] | Rep. Elijah Cummings [D-MD] | Rep. Bob Filner [D-CA] | Rep. Charles Gonzalez [D-TX] |
Rep. Bart Gordon [D-TN] | Rep. Gene Green [D-TX] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Ralph Hall [R-TX] |
Rep. Maurice Hinchey [D-NY] | Rep. Tim Holden [D-PA] | Rep. Jesse Jackson [D-IL] | Rep. Walter Jones [R-NC] |
Rep. Dale Kildee [D-MI] | Rep. Charlie Melancon [D-LA] | Rep. George Miller [D-CA] | Rep. Harry Mitchell [D-AZ] |
Rep. William Owens [D-NY] | Rep. Loretta Sanchez [D-CA] | Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Joe Sestak [D-PA] |
Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] | Rep. Robert Wexler [D-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-11 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Healthy Families and Communities. | |
2009-05-14 | Referred to House Education and Labor | |
2009-05-14 | Referred to House Ways and Means | |
2009-05-14 | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2365 (Related) 2009-06-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Healthy Families and Communities.
HB4193 (Related) 2010-01-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
HB5275 (Related) 2010-06-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
HB4193 (Related) 2010-01-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
HB5275 (Related) 2010-06-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Aging
Consumer affairs
Economics and public finance
Inflation and prices
Social security and elderly assistance
Consumer affairs
Economics and public finance
Inflation and prices
Social security and elderly assistance
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-bill/2429/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hr2429/BILLS-111hr2429ih.pdf |