US HB2447 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-11-23 - Became Public Law No: 112-59.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-11-23 - Became Public Law No: 112-59.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the award of a single Congressional Gold Medal to collectively honor the Montford Point Marines, U.S. Marine Corps, in recognition of their dedicated service during World War II. (Camp Montford Point, North Carolina, was the site for the training of the first African-American Marines.) Permits the Secretary of the Treasury to strike and sell duplicates in bronze of the gold medal, at a price sufficient to cover the costs of the medals. Authorizes appropriations.
Title
To grant the congressional gold medal to the Montford Point Marines.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-10-25 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass (Y: 422 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-11-23 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 112-59. |
2011-11-23 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2011-11-15 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2011-11-10 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2011-11-09 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2011-11-09 | Senate | Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7304) |
2011-10-31 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
2011-10-25 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2011-10-25 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 422 - 0 (Roll no. 804). (text: CR H7024) |
2011-10-25 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7043-7044) |
2011-10-25 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2011-10-25 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2447. |
2011-10-25 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7024-7030) |
2011-10-25 | House | Mr. Jones moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2011-10-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Domestic Monetary Policy and Technology. |
2011-07-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2011-07-07 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1263-1264) |
Same As/Similar To
SB1527 (Related) 2011-09-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Congressional tributes
Military history
Military personnel and dependents
North Carolina
Racial and ethnic relations
Congressional tributes
Military history
Military personnel and dependents
North Carolina
Racial and ethnic relations