US HB2447 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Low-Income Solar Act This bill requires the Department of Energy to establish a loan and grant program for photovoltaic solar (a method of converting energy from the sun into electricity) installations in low-income and underserved areas for FY2018-FY2032. Loans must be provided for: (1) community solar facilities that provide solar energy to low-income households, or (2) solar installations at federally subsidized affordable housing at multi-family complexes. The community solar facilities must: (1) be owned by an organization of electricity consumers that own a share of the facility's solar electricity generation, (2) have a certain a nameplate rating (or power generation capacity), (3) be located in or near a community that uses the electricity generated by the facility, and (4) reserve at least 25% of the electricity generated for low-income households. Grants must be given for: (1) solar electricity generating facilities installed on properties of eligible, low-income home owners; or (2) new solar projects for low-income households and individuals, including the costs of equipment and job training associated with solar projects.
Title
Low-Income Solar Act
Sponsors
Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Keith Ellison [D-MN] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy. |
2017-05-16 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2017-05-16 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2479 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
HB3314 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
SB987 (Related) 2017-07-11 - Star Print ordered on the bill.
HB3314 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
SB987 (Related) 2017-07-11 - Star Print ordered on the bill.
Subjects
Alternative and renewable resources
Electric power generation and transmission
Employment and training programs
Energy
Government lending and loan guarantees
Low- and moderate-income housing
Residential rehabilitation and home repair
Electric power generation and transmission
Employment and training programs
Energy
Government lending and loan guarantees
Low- and moderate-income housing
Residential rehabilitation and home repair
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/2447/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr2447/BILLS-115hr2447ih.pdf |