US HB2488 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on June 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Rogue Wilderness Area Expansion Act - Adds specified federal land managed by the Bureau of Land Management (BLM) in the Wild Rogue Wilderness as a component of the National Wilderness Preservation System. Requires the part of the Rogue River, which lies within the Wild Rogue Wilderness, including the Wilderness additions, and was designated under the Wild and Scenic Rivers Act as a component of the System in 1968, to be managed as a wild river. Amends the Wild and Scenic Rivers Act to add specified segments of creeks to the designation of the Rogue River in Oregon as a component of the national wild and scenic rivers system. Prohibits: (1) the Federal Energy Regulatory Commission (FERC) from licensing the construction of any dam, water conduit, reservoir, powerhouse, transmission line, or other project works affecting specified stream segments; and (2) any federal department or agency from assisting in the construction of any water resources project affecting any such segment, except for maintaining or repairing existing projects.
Title
Rogue Wilderness Area Expansion Act
Sponsors
Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR] | Rep. Kurt Schrader [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation. |
2013-06-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
SB353 (Related) 2013-09-10 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 178.
SB1784 (Related) 2014-12-11 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 646.
SB2734 (Related) 2014-07-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB4 (Related) 2014-11-13 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 597.
SB1784 (Related) 2014-12-11 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 646.
SB2734 (Related) 2014-07-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB4 (Related) 2014-11-13 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 597.
Subjects
Dams and canals
Electric power generation and transmission
Lakes and rivers
Licensing and registrations
Oregon
Public lands and natural resources
Water storage
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Electric power generation and transmission
Lakes and rivers
Licensing and registrations
Oregon
Public lands and natural resources
Water storage
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/2488/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr2488/BILLS-113hr2488ih.pdf |