US HB2665 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-17 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-17 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of Energy (DOE) to establish and carry out a smart energy and water efficiency program. Under the program, DOE must award grants to water authorities (i.e., authorities that provide water, wastewater, or water reuse services) for implementing advanced and innovative technology-based solutions that will improve the energy or efficiency of water, wastewater, and water reuse systems.
Title
Smart Energy and Water Efficiency Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA] | Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL] | Rep. Jeff Van Drew [R-NJ] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2019-07-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-05-16 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote . |
2019-05-16 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-05-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife. |
2019-05-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment. |
2019-05-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy. |
2019-05-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-10 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-04-10 | House | Hearings Held by the Subcommittee on Energy Prior to Introduction and Referral. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2019 (Related) 2019-04-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
HB2741 (Related) 2019-06-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
SB2799 (Related) 2020-01-07 - By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 116-198.
HB4447 (Related) 2020-10-19 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB2741 (Related) 2019-06-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
SB2799 (Related) 2020-01-07 - By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 116-198.
HB4447 (Related) 2020-10-19 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Subjects
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Computers and information technology
Energy efficiency and conservation
Environmental protection
Environmental technology
Internet and video services
Public utilities and utility rates
Water quality
Water use and supply
Computers and information technology
Energy efficiency and conservation
Environmental protection
Environmental technology
Internet and video services
Public utilities and utility rates
Water quality
Water use and supply
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2665/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2665/BILLS-116hr2665ih.pdf |