US HB2748 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-13)
Status: Introduced on May 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
SOS Act of 2017 Save Our Seas Act of 2017 This bill amends the Marine Debris Act to revise the Marine Debris Program to require the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration (NOAA) to work with: (1) other agencies to address both land- and sea-based sources of marine debris, and (2) the Department of State and other agencies to promote international action to reduce the incidence of marine debris. The bill also revises the program by allowing NOAA to make sums available for assisting in the cleanup and response required by severe marine debris events. NOAA must prioritize assistance for activities that respond to a severe marine debris event in: (1) a rural or remote community, or (2) a habitat of national concern. The bill urges the President to: (1) work with foreign countries that contribute the most to the global marine debris problem in order to find a solution to the problem; (2) study issues related to marine debris, including the economic impacts of marine debris; and (3) encourage the Office of the U.S. Trade Representative to consider the impact of marine debris in relevant future trade agreements. The Interagency Marine Debris Coordinating Committee must expand to include a senior official from the State Department or from the Department of the Interior. This bill reauthorizes for FY2018-FY2022: (1) the Marine Debris Program, (2) an information clearinghouse on marine debris, and (3) enforcement of laws about discarded marine debris from ships.
Title
SOS Act of 2017 Save Our Seas Act of 2017
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans. |
2017-05-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation. |
2017-05-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-05-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-05-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-05-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB756 (Same As) 2018-12-21 - Signed by President.
Subjects
Coast guard
Department of Commerce
Department of Homeland Security
Department of State
Department of the Interior
Economic performance and conditions
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental protection
Executive agency funding and structure
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Infrastructure development
International law and treaties
International organizations and cooperation
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Marine and inland water transportation
Marine pollution
Materials
Research and development
Rural conditions and development
Solid waste and recycling
Trade agreements and negotiations
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Department of Commerce
Department of Homeland Security
Department of State
Department of the Interior
Economic performance and conditions
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental protection
Executive agency funding and structure
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Infrastructure development
International law and treaties
International organizations and cooperation
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Marine and inland water transportation
Marine pollution
Materials
Research and development
Rural conditions and development
Solid waste and recycling
Trade agreements and negotiations
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/2748/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr2748/BILLS-115hr2748ih.pdf |