US HB2798 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on July 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-29 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 248.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-29 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 248.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Secretary of the Interior and the Secretary of Agriculture (USDA) (the Secretary with respect to lands under the respective jurisdiction), for any film crew of five persons or fewer, to require a permit and assess an annual fee of $200 for commercial filming activities or similar projects on federal lands and waterways administered by the Secretary. Makes such a permit valid for such activities or projects that occur in areas designated for public use during public hours on all federal lands and waterways administered by the Secretary for a 12-month period. Prohibits the Secretary, for persons holding such a permit, from assessing any additional fee for commercial filming activities and similar projects that occur in those areas during those hours. Bars the Secretary from prohibiting, as a motorized vehicle or under any other purposes, the use of cameras or related equipment used for commercial filming activities or similar projects in accordance with this Act on federal lands and waterways administered by the Secretary. Requires the Secretary to recover (under current law, collect) costs incurred as a result of filming activities or similar projects, including but not limited to, administrative and personnel costs.
Title
To amend Public Law 106-206 to direct the Secretary of the Interior and the Secretary of Agriculture to require annual permits and assess annual fees for commercial filming activities on Federal land for film crews of 5 persons or fewer.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH] | Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS] | Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-29 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 248. |
2014-01-29 | House | Committee on Agriculture discharged. |
2014-01-29 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-335, Part I. |
2013-11-14 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 19 - 15. |
2013-11-14 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2013-11-14 | House | Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs Discharged. |
2013-11-14 | House | Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation Discharged. |
2013-08-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation, Energy, and Forestry. |
2013-08-02 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2013-07-30 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation. |
2013-07-30 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs. |
2013-07-23 | House | Referred to House Agriculture |
2013-07-23 | House | Referred to House Natural Resources |
2013-07-23 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1335 (Related) 2013-07-18 - Introduced in the Senate. Read twice. Ordered Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 143.
HB3197 (Related) 2013-10-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
HB3590 (Related) 2014-02-10 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 305.
SB2363 (Related) 2014-07-10 - Cloture on the bill not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 41 - 56. Record Vote Number: 220. (consideration: CR S4377-4378; text: CR S4377)
HB3197 (Related) 2013-10-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
HB3590 (Related) 2014-02-10 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 305.
SB2363 (Related) 2014-07-10 - Cloture on the bill not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 41 - 56. Record Vote Number: 220. (consideration: CR S4377-4378; text: CR S4377)
Subjects
General public lands matters
Licensing and registrations
Public lands and natural resources
Television and film
User charges and fees
Licensing and registrations
Public lands and natural resources
Television and film
User charges and fees