US HB2846 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on December 3 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-12-03 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 3 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-12-03 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Federal Agency Customer Experience Act of 2018 This bill exempts an agency's authority to collect information that is voluntary feedback from the federal information resources management activities authority of the the Office of Management and Budget (OMB) under the Paperwork Reduction Act. "Voluntary feedback" is defined as any submission of information, opinion, or concern that is: (1) voluntarily made by a specific individual or entity relating to a particular service of or transaction with an agency, and (2) specifically solicited by that agency. Each agency that solicits voluntary feedback shall ensure that: responses to the solicitation remain anonymous, individuals who decline to participate shall not be treated differently by the agency for purposes of providing services or information, the voluntary nature of the solicitation is clear, and the proposed solicitation of voluntary feedback will contribute to improved customer service. Each agency shall: (1) collect voluntary feedback with respect to its services and transactions, (2) annually publish such feedback on its website and report on such feedback to OMB, and (3) publish aggregated reports on the solicitation of such feedback. OMB shall: (1) develop a set of standardized questions for use by agencies in collecting such feedback on service satisfaction, timeliness, and professionalism; and (2) include and maintain on a publicly available website links to the information provided on the agency websites. The Government Accountability Office shall make publicly available and submit to Congress a scorecard report assessing the quality of services provided to the public by each agency.
Title
Federal Agency Customer Experience Act of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. Blake Farenthold [R-TX] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2018-11-29 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2018-11-29 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-11-29 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9714-9715) |
2018-11-29 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2846. |
2018-11-29 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9714-9716) |
2018-11-29 | House | Mr. Comer moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-11-27 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 810. |
2018-11-27 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 115-1043. |
2018-06-05 | House | ASSUMING FIRST SPONSORSHIP - Mr. Fitzpatrick asked unanimous consent that he may hereafter be considered as the primary sponsor of H.R. 2846, a bill originally introduced by Representative Farenthold, for the purpose of adding cosponsors and requesting reprintings under clause 7 of rule XII. |
2018-03-15 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2018-03-15 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-06-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
2017-06-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1088 (Related) 2017-11-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations
Performance measurement
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations
Performance measurement