US HB2941 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires U.S. military service departments to encourage separating and retiring female service members to participate in the Women's Health Transition Training Program, which provides information on care available from the Department of Veterans Affairs. The bill requires military installations that have specified centers for transition assistance to advertise the program.
Title
Servicewomen’s Health Transition Training Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA] | Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA] | Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA] | Rep. Lee Zeldin [R-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. |
2019-06-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-05-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. |
2019-05-23 | House | Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-23 | House | Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-23 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2324 (Related) 2019-07-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Congressional oversight
Health promotion and preventive care
Veterans' medical care
Women's health
Congressional oversight
Health promotion and preventive care
Veterans' medical care
Women's health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2941/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2941/BILLS-116hr2941ih.pdf |