US HB3272 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on June 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Substance Abuse and Mental Health Services Administration to design national strategies and implement programs to address chronic homelessness. The bill further requires the Department of Health and Human Services to award grants for permanent supportive-housing services; mental health services; substance use disorder treatment; integrated, coordinated treatment for co-occurring disorders; health education; services designed to help individuals and families make progress toward self-sufficiency; and other supportive services that promote an end to chronic homelessness. Priority for grants is given to applicants that target services to individuals and families who have experienced more homelessness, use more public emergency-care services, or have a history with the criminal justice system.
Title
Services for Ending Long-Term Homelessness Act
Sponsors
Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] |
Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Jimmy Gomez [D-CA] | Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] |
Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS] | Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA] | Rep. Val Demings [D-FL] |
Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL] | Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA] | Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] | Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-06-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-06-13 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E770) |
2019-06-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB5738 (Related) 2020-01-30 - Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
SB1790 (Similar To) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
SB1790 (Similar To) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Disability and paralysis
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Family services
Health
Health care quality
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Homelessness and emergency shelter
Housing and community development funding
Housing supply and affordability
Mental health
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Family services
Health
Health care quality
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Homelessness and emergency shelter
Housing and community development funding
Housing supply and affordability
Mental health
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/3272/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr3272/BILLS-116hr3272ih.pdf |