US HB328 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-02-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-02-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Washington-Rochambeau Revolutionary Route National Historic Trail Designation Act - Amends the National Trails System Act to designate a corridor of approximately 600 miles following the route taken by the armies of General George Washington and Count Rochambeau between Newport, Rhode Island, and Yorktown, Virginia, in 1781 and 1782, as the "Washington-Rochambeau Revolutionary Route National Historic Trail." Directs the Secretary of the Interior, in consultation with the Secretary of Energy and private industry, to submit a report which: (1) contains a description of the energy resources available on such land and report on the amount of energy withdrawn from possible development; and (2) identifies the oil, natural gas, geothermal, wind, and solar energy that could be commercially produced, the annual available biomass for energy production, and any hydropower resources available, including tidal, dams, and in-stream flow turbines, and any impact on electricity transmission.
Title
Washington-Rochambeau Revolutionary Route National Historic Trail Designation Act
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Castle [R-DE] | Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT] | Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY] | Rep. Chaka Fattah [D-PA] |
Rep. Maurice Hinchey [D-NY] | Rep. Rush Holt [D-NJ] | Rep. Patrick Kennedy [D-RI] | Rep. Nita Lowey [D-NY] |
Rep. James Moran [D-VA] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] | Rep. Patrick Murphy [R-PA] | Rep. James Oberstar [D-MN] |
Rep. Allyson Schwartz [D-PA] | Rep. Jose Serrano [D-NY] | Rep. Joe Sestak [D-PA] | Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-04 | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands. | |
2009-01-08 | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB146 (Related) 2009-03-30 - Became Public Law No: 111-11.
SB22 (Related) 2009-03-11 - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 282 - 144 (Roll no. 117).
SB22 (Related) 2009-03-11 - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 282 - 144 (Roll no. 117).
Subjects
Alternative and renewable resources
Conflicts and wars
Connecticut
Delaware
District of Columbia
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Europe
Historic sites and heritage areas
Land transfers
Maryland
Massachusetts
New Jersey
New York State
Oil and gas
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Pennsylvania
Property rights
Public lands and natural resources
Rhode Island
United Kingdom
Virginia
Conflicts and wars
Connecticut
Delaware
District of Columbia
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Europe
Historic sites and heritage areas
Land transfers
Maryland
Massachusetts
New Jersey
New York State
Oil and gas
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Pennsylvania
Property rights
Public lands and natural resources
Rhode Island
United Kingdom
Virginia
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-bill/328/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hr328/BILLS-111hr328ih.pdf |