US HB3314 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - Became Public Law No: 116-90. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - Became Public Law No: 116-90. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 1750 McCulloch Boulevard North in Lake Havasu City, Arizona, as the "Lake Havasu City Combat Veterans Memorial Post Office Building."
Title
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 1750 McCulloch Boulevard North in Lake Havasu City, Arizona, as the "Lake Havasu City Combat Veterans Memorial Post Office Building".
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] | Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ] | Rep. Ann Kirkpatrick [D-AZ] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] |
Rep. Andy Biggs [R-AZ] | Rep. David Schweikert [R-AZ] | Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] | Rep. Debbie Lesko [R-AZ] |
Rep. Greg Stanton [D-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-13 | House | Became Public Law No: 116-90. (TXT | PDF) |
2019-12-13 | House | Signed by President. |
2019-12-04 | House | Presented to President. |
2019-11-25 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2019-11-21 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6767) |
2019-11-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 303. |
2019-11-07 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. Without written report. |
2019-11-06 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2019-10-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2019-10-16 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-10-16 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8175) |
2019-10-16 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3314. |
2019-10-16 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8174-8175) |
2019-10-16 | House | Mr. Rouda moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-07-25 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-06-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform. |
2019-06-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Arizona
Congressional tributes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Postal service
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Congressional tributes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Postal service
Veterans' organizations and recognition