US HB338 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-02-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-02-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Boy Scouts of America Land Transfer Act of 2009 - Authorizes the Utah National Parks Council of the Boy Scouts of America (the Boy Scouts) to convey to Brian Head Resort certain public land in Utah acquired under the Recreation and Public Purposes Act for the purpose of operating a camp in exchange for conveyance by Brian Head Resort of certain of its private land to the Boy Scouts.
Title
Boy Scouts of America Land Transfer Act of 2009
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Matheson [D-UT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-04 | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands. | |
2009-01-08 | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB146 (Related) 2009-03-30 - Became Public Law No: 111-11.
SB22 (Related) 2009-03-11 - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 282 - 144 (Roll no. 117).
SB215 (Related) 2009-01-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB22 (Related) 2009-03-11 - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 282 - 144 (Roll no. 117).
SB215 (Related) 2009-01-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-bill/338/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hr338/BILLS-111hr338ih.pdf |