US HB3433 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Introduced on May 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Pending: House Foreign Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Pending: House Foreign Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the State Department Basic Authorities Act of 1956 to establish a United States Ambassador at Large for Arctic Affairs, and for other purposes.
Title
Arctic Diplomacy Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN] | Rep. William Keating [D-MA] | Rep. Sara Jacobs [D-CA] | Rep. Anthony Gonzalez [R-OH] |
Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] | Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA] | Rep. Ami Bera [D-CA] |
Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH] | Rep. Ed Case [D-HI] | Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA] | Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY] |
Rep. Young Kim [R-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2021-05-20 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3361 (Related) 2021-05-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
HB3524 (Related) 2022-12-30 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 486.
SB1169 (Related) 2021-05-10 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 54.
SB1201 (Related) 2021-12-15 - Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported favorably.
HB3524 (Related) 2022-12-30 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 486.
SB1169 (Related) 2021-05-10 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 54.
SB1201 (Related) 2021-12-15 - Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported favorably.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/3433/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr3433/BILLS-117hr3433ih.pdf |