US HB3534 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on May 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Pending: House Conservation and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Pending: House Conservation and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To direct the Secretary of Agriculture to select and implement landscape-scale forest restoration projects, to assist communities in increasing their resilience to wildfire, and for other purposes.
Title
Wildfire Emergency Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA] | Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] | Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA] | Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] |
Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA] | Rep. Luis Correa [D-CA] | Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry. |
2021-07-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2021-05-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy. |
2021-05-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management. |
2021-05-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on Agriculture, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, Natural Resources, Energy and Commerce, and Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-05-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1855 (Same As) 2021-05-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
SB2806 (Related) 2021-10-21 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held.
SB2806 (Related) 2021-10-21 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/3534/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr3534/BILLS-117hr3534ih.pdf |