US HB3616 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on July 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Environmental Protection Agency (EPA) to address certain perfluoroalkyl and polyfluoroalkyl substances, commonly known as PFAS. These man-made substances may have adverse human health effects. A variety of products contain these substances, such as nonstick cookware, waterproof clothing, stain-resistant fabrics, food packaging, and fire-fighting foams. The bill requires the EPA to expand the list of toxic pollutants under the Clean Water Act to include such substances. In addition, the EPA must develop effluent standards and pretreatment standards for the substances.
Title
Clean Water Standards for PFAS Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH] | Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI] | Rep. Brendan Boyle [D-PA] | Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment. |
2019-07-02 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2019-07-02 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental regulatory procedures
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Water quality
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental regulatory procedures
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Water quality
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/3616/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr3616/BILLS-116hr3616ih.pdf |