US HB3638 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-09 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Pending: House Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-09 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Pending: House Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires a federal contracting officer, upon written request from an unsuccessful offeror for a task order or delivery order, to provide a brief explanation as to why such offeror was unsuccessful. Specifically, this applies to an offer in an amount greater than the simplified acquisition threshold and less than or equal to $5.5 million issued under an indefinite delivery-indefinite quantity contract.
Title
Small Business Acquisition Transparency Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform. |
2019-07-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Public contracts and procurement
Small business
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Public contracts and procurement
Small business
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/3638/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr3638/BILLS-116hr3638ih.pdf |