US HB3926 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-3)
Status: Introduced on October 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-25 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-25 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Armed Forces Breast Cancer Research Act - Directs the Secretaries of Defense and Veterans Affairs to jointly conduct a study on the incidence of breast cancer among members of the Armed Forces and veterans and report study results to Congress.
Title
Armed Forces Breast Cancer Research Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | Subcommittee Hearings Held. | |
2009-11-05 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. | |
2009-10-30 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. | |
2009-10-26 | Referred to House Veterans' Affairs | |
2009-10-26 | Referred to House Armed Services | |
2009-10-26 | Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Cancer
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Medical research
Military medicine
Military personnel and dependents
National Guard and reserves
Veterans' medical care
Cancer
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Medical research
Military medicine
Military personnel and dependents
National Guard and reserves
Veterans' medical care
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-bill/3926/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hr3926/BILLS-111hr3926ih.pdf |