US HB3977 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Introduced on July 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-15 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 532.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-15 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 532.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expands Native American tribal criminal jurisdiction over crimes of domestic violence to include sex trafficking, sexual violence, stalking, and related conduct. The bill also authorizes a tribe to exercise jurisdiction over a non-Native American defendant regardless of whether the defendant resides on the tribe's lands, is employed on the tribe's lands, or is a spouse, dating partner, or intimate partner of a Native American who resides on the tribe's lands.
Title
Justice for Native Survivors of Sexual Violence Act
Sponsors
Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM] | Rep. Paul Cook [R-CA] | Rep. Sharice Davids [D-KS] | Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] |
Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] | Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] |
Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI] | Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] | Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI] | Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA] |
Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] | Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] | Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] |
Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-15 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 532. |
2020-12-15 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-648. |
2019-12-05 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 22 - 7. |
2019-12-05 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-12-05 | House | Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States Discharged. |
2019-08-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States. |
2019-07-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-07-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB288 (Same As) 2019-06-19 - Committee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held.
Subjects
Assault and harassment offenses
Crime victims
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Domestic violence and child abuse
Human trafficking
Indian social and development programs
Jurisdiction and venue
Native Americans
Sex offenses
Crime victims
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Domestic violence and child abuse
Human trafficking
Indian social and development programs
Jurisdiction and venue
Native Americans
Sex offenses